RI S0851 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Validates and ratifies amendments to the home rule charter of the town of Coventry, which amendments were adopted and approved by the electors of the town of Coventry on November 6, 2018.
Title
Validating And Ratifying Amendments To The Home Rule Charter Of The Town Of Coventry
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-08 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-05-07 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/08/2019) |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/07/2019) |