RI S0865 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for greater school-based management at the school level and expands the duties of school improvement teams and establishes a new chapter on education accountability..
Title
Education Accountability Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2019) |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/05/2019) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Meeting postponed (05/29/2019) |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2019) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |