RI S0866 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2019)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Hearing: Jun 19 Senate Education Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes testing requirements for initial certification of new teachers on or after July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Certification Of Teachers - Testing Requirements For New Teachers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14SenateScheduled for consideration (06/19/2019)
2019-06-12SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-06-07SenateScheduled for consideration (06/12/2019)
2019-06-05SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-05-28SenateScheduled for consideration (06/05/2019)
2019-05-28SenateMeeting postponed (05/29/2019)
2019-05-24SenateScheduled for consideration
2019-05-15SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-05-10SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2019)
2019-05-08SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Education

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback