RI S0869 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows teachers to obtain certification as a principal in an expedited period of time.
Title
Certification Of Teachers
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] |
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-26 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/05/2019) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Meeting postponed (05/29/2019) |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2019) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |