RI S0892 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from taxation the real and tangible personal property of Providence Country Day School, a Rhode Island nonprofit corporation, located in East Providence, Rhode Island.
Title
Property Subject To Taxation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-11 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-25 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-12 | House | Committee transferred to House Municipal Government |
2019-06-05 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/04/2019) |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |