RI S0895 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that pharmacists shall disclose lesser price drug substitutions unless directed otherwise by the doctor. Exempts pharmacists automatically charging the lowest available price.
Title
Pharmacies
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0895.pdf |