RI S0897 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Effectuates the consolidation of the Albion and Saylesville Fire Districts into a newly created Lincoln Fire District.
Title
Relating To Consolidation Of The Albion And Saylesville Fire Districts Into The New Lincoln Fire District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-24 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-11 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-24 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-20 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-14 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2019) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2019) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |