RI S0907 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-26 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-26 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Permits a Certificate C limited premises electrical license to be issued to the University of Rhode Island to perform certain electrical maintenance and repair.
Title
Electricians
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2019) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |