RI S0909 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides employer pays any excess damages for an injured minor/clarifies liability of employer for violation of continuation of health care benefits for injured employee caused by employer/repeals obsolete/inapplicable workers' compensation laws.
Title
Workers' Compensation
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-24 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-24 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-06-20 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-19 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred to House Labor |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2019) |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2019) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |