RI S0910 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Referred to House Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Referred to House Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates requirement to pay attorney fees from employment security (unemployment) administrative fund.
Title
Employment Security--benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | House | Referred to House Labor |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2019) |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2019) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |