RI S0914 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a veteran who qualifies to be buried at the Rhode Island veterans' memorial cemetery to designate a domestic partner to be buried with them.
Title
Burial Of Veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2019) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0914.pdf |