RI S0940 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates an 11 member commission to study of Rhode Island's Education Funding Formula, and who would report back to the Senate by January 2, 2020, and bi-annually thereafter, and whose life would expire on March 2, 2021.
Title
The Education Equity And Property Tax Relief Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2019) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |