RI S0942 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes board of trustees for URI; establishes transfer of URI research foundation authority to board of governors if foundation dissolved; removes authority of council on postsecondary education over URI, requires disclosure of tuition waivers.
Title
Relating To The Governance Of The University Of Rhode Island
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/12/2019) |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2019) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0942.pdf |