RI S0951 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Replaces two (2) employees from the department of health with one municipal official and would add one practicing, licensed emergency medical technician to serve on the ambulance service coordinating advisory board.
Title
Emergency Medical Transportation Services
Sponsors
Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Emt services approval of amendment (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Emt services approval of amendment (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-26 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2019) |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |