RI S0952 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the existing provisions of the Corporate Charter and replaces them in their entirety.
Title
Amendment Of Corporate Charter
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-11 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-26 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-20 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |