RI S0985 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to House Municipal Government
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to House Municipal Government
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Enables the city of Providence to adopt a homestead tax exemption. The value of the $350,000 would receive a homestead exemption of 40% of value while the remaining value would receive a homestead exemption of 28% of value.
Title
Providence Homestead Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |