RI S0999 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Dr. Ryan Matthew Marnane to join Laura Holmstedt and Jerry Richardson in marriage on or about October 26, 2019, within the City of Newport, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-11 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |