RI S1013 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the name of Gold Star Parents Day to Gold Star Family Day.
Title
Relating To Holidays And Days Of Special Observance
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
Sen. James Seveney [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2019) |