RI S1032 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that instruction in health and physical education include information provided to students that mixing opioids and alcohol can cause accidental death.
Title
Curriculum [see Title 16 Chapter 97 -- The Rhode Island Board Of Education Act]
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2019) |