RI S2188 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a fee on companies that sell fossil fuels in Rhode Island and also establishes a receipt account to disburse the funds from.
Title
Energize Rhode Island: Clean Energy Investment And Carbon Pricing Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
Sen. James Seveney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/21/2018) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2188.pdf |