RI S2525 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Have the health insurance commissioner adopt a uniform set of medical criteria for prior authorization and create required forms to be used by a health insurer, including telemedicine coverage.
Title
The Rhode Island Health Care Reform Act Of 2004--health Insurance Oversight
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] |
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2020) |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/27/2020) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2020) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |