RI S2740 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows railroad companies who hold a Class G license to serve alcohol at retail aboard its trains and in its controlled station premises up to 60 minutes prior to a train's scheduled departure.
Title
Retail Licenses
Sponsors
Sen. Marc Cote [D] | Sen. Roger Picard [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-22 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2018-06-22 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-06-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2018) |
2018-05-03 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/02/2018) |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2018) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |