RI S2824 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Creates a new process with standards to be utilized when deciding whether an applicant's past conviction of a crime should disqualify the applicant from receiving an occupational license, permit, certificate, or registration issued by the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Equal Opportunity And Affirmative Action -- Licensing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-16 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-22SenateSigned by Governor
2020-07-17SenateTransmitted to Governor
2020-07-16HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2020-07-14HousePlaced on House Calendar (07/16/2020)
2020-07-13SenateSenate passed Sub A
2020-07-10SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (07/13/2020)
2020-07-09SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2020-07-03SenateProposed Substitute
2020-07-03SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/09/2020)
2020-03-12SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback