RI S2861 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Smithfield to issue a total of five (5) Class A liquor store licenses.
Title
Class A Liquor Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-27 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-06-18 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2020-06-18 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/18/2020) |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2020) |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/15/2020) |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |