RI S2907 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows The Honorable Steven R. DeToy to join Marishka Trew DeToy and William Bradford Ames in marriage on or about August 22, 2020, within the Town of Westerly, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-06-18 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2020-06-18 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/18/2020) |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2020) |