SC H3003 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-05 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Toole
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-05 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Toole
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND SECTION 16-23-460, AS AMENDED, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO CONCEALED WEAPONS AND THE FORFEITURE OF WEAPONS WHEN A VIOLATION OCCURS, SO AS TO INCREASE THE FINE FOR A VIOLATION; TO AMEND SECTION 16-23-50, AS AMENDED, RELATING TO PENALTIES FOR WEAPONS VIOLATIONS AND FORFEITURE OF HANDGUNS, SO AS TO DELETE OBSOLETE REFERENCES TO SECTION 16-23-20; TO AMEND SECTION 23-31-215, AS AMENDED, RELATING TO THE ISSUANCE OF CONCEALED WEAPON PERMITS, SO AS TO SPECIFICALLY ENUMERATE THOSE PERSONS NOT REQUIRED TO OBTAIN A CONCEALED WEAPON PERMIT; TO AMEND SECTION 23-31-220, RELATING TO THE RIGHT TO ALLOW CONCEALED WEAPONS UPON CERTAIN PREMISES, SO AS TO SPECIFICALLY ENUMERATE THOSE PERSONS THAT ARE EXEMPTED FROM THE PURVIEW OF THE STATUTE; TO AMEND SECTION 63-19-1210, RELATING TO TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION FOR CERTAIN JUVENILE OFFENSES, SO AS TO CORRECT A REFERENCE; AND TO REPEAL SECTION 16-23-20 RELATING TO THE UNLAWFUL CARRYING OF A HANDGUN AND SECTION 23-31-217 RELATING TO THE EFFECT OF SECTION 16-23-20.
Title
Correct A Reference; And To Repeal Section 16-23-20 Relating To The Unlawful Carrying Of A Handgun And Section 23-31-217 Relating To The Effect Of Section 16-23-20.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-05 | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Toole | |
2009-02-17 | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Skelton | |
2009-02-10 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Skelton | |
2009-01-28 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: E.H.Pitts | |
2009-01-13 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-17 | |
2009-01-13 | Introduced and read first time HJ-16 | |
2008-12-09 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2008-12-09 | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 23 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 23 | 460 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 23 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 31 | 215 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 31 | 217 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 31 | 220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 19 | 1210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3003&session=118 |