SC H3016 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of Goff Avenue In The City Of Orangeburg From Its Intersection With United States Highway 601 To Its Intersection With United States Highway 21 "dr. H.n. Tisdale Avenue" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Portion Of Highway Containing This Designation.
Title
Dr. H.N. Tisdale Avenue
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-27 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2019-02-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-02-21 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2019-02-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, S.Williams, Rivers |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |