SC H3020 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 59-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, To Enact The "south Carolina Fetal Heartbeat Protection From Abortion Act" By Adding Article 6 To Chapter 41, Title 44 So As To Require Testing For A Detectable Fetal Heartbeat Before An Abortion Is Performed On A Pregnant Woman And To Prohibit The Performance Of An Abortion When A Fetal Heartbeat Is Detected, Both With Medical Emergency Exceptions, To Require Certain Documentation And Recordkeeping By Physicians Performing Abortions, To Create A Civil Action For A Pregnant Woman Upon Whom An Abortion Is Performed, To Create Criminal Penalties, And For Other Purposes; To Amend Section 44-41-460, Relating To Required Reporting Of Abortion Data To The Department Of Health And Environmental Control, So As To Add Reporting Of Fetal Heartbeat Testing And Patient Medical Condition Data; And To Amend Section 44-41-330, Relating To A Pregnant Woman's Right To Know Certain Pregnancy Information, So As To Require Notification Of The Detection Of A Fetal Heartbeat.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SC Fetal Heartbeat Protection from Abortion Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 64 N: 22 NV: 14 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 13 (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 11 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 12 (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 11 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 11 (Y: 72 N: 25 NV: 11 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 9 (Y: 70 N: 25 NV: 11 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 8 (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 10 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 7 (Y: 73 N: 27 NV: 10 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 5 (Y: 74 N: 30 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 4 (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 10 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 3 (Y: 75 N: 28 NV: 8 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Table Amendment Number 1 (Y: 38 N: 62 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 70 N: 31 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Adjourn For The Day (Y: 38 N: 68 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Cloture (Y: 55 N: 52 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-15 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-01-14SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs
2019-04-25 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-04-25SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2019-04-25SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-25HouseRoll call Yeas-64 Nays-22
2019-04-25HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-04-24HouseRoll call Yeas-70 Nays-31
2019-04-24HouseRead second time
2019-04-24HouseAmended
2019-04-24HouseDebate interrupted
2019-04-24HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning
2019-04-09HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2019-04-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Stringer
2019-04-05 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2019-03-21HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: Wheeler, Thigpen
2019-03-19HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Tallon, Taylor
2019-03-05HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton
2019-02-21HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis
2019-01-17HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Crawford
2019-01-15HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hewitt
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-12-18HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0032 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4441330(n/a)See Bill Text
4441460(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3020&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3020_20181218.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3020_20190404.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3020_20190405.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3020_20190424.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3020_20190425.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3020_20200114.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3020_20200115.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16558
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16559
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16572
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16575
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16562
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16563
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16564
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16565
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16566
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16567
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16568
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16569
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16570
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16571

Bill Comments

feedback