SC H3024 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 2-1-60 So As To Provide That No Person Is Eligible For Election To The House Of Representatives If That Person Has Served Six Terms In The Same Body, That No Person Is Eligible For Election To The Senate If That Person Has Served Four Terms In The Same Body, And To Provide That Any Term Served, For Which The Election Was Held Prior To January 1, 2019, Must Not Be Counted As A Term Served.
Title
General Assembly term limits
Sponsors
Rep. Bobby Cox [R] | Rep. Adam Morgan [R] | Rep. Jason Elliott [R] | Rep. Nancy Mace [R] |
Rep. Bill Taylor [R] | Rep. Stewart Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones |
2019-02-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Taylor |
2019-01-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Mace |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3024&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3024_20181218.htm |