SC H3035 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 54
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Act No. 54
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 7-13-72, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Managers Of Election, So As To Provide That A Clerk Appointed From Among The Managers For Each Polling Place Must Be A Resident And Registered Elector Of The Respective County In Which He Is Appointed To Work Or In An Adjoining County; To Amend Section 7-13-80, Relating To The Organization Of Boards Of Voter Registration And Elections And Managers And Clerks, So As To Provide That A Chairman Of A Board Of Managers Must Be A Resident And Registered Elector Of The Respective County In Which He Is Appointed To Work Or In An Adjoining County; And To Amend Section 7-13-110, Relating To Poll Managers And Their Assistants, So As To Provide That A Chairman Or Clerk Appointed From Among The Managers For The Various Polling Places Must Be A Resident And Registered Elector Of The Respective County In Which He Is Appointed To Work Or In An Adjoining County, To Provide That A Manager Who Is Not Appointed To Serve As A Chairman Or Clerk Must Be A Resident And A Registered Elector Of The State Of South Carolina, And To Require That Any Person Qualified To Serve As A Manager Who Requests To Work In His Resident County Or In An Adjoining County Must Be Given Priority Over Qualified Persons From Other Counties For Appointment To Work In The Resident County Or In An Adjoining County. - Ratified Title
Title
Poll managers and assistants
Sponsors
Rep. Laurie Funderburk [D] | Rep. Ivory Thigpen [D] | Rep. Weston Newton [R] | Rep. Robert Williams [D] |
Rep. William Wheeler [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 1a (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 112 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 112 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Act No. 54 | |
2019-05-31 | Effective date 05/16/19 | |
2019-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-05-13 | Ratified R 74 | |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2019-05-09 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2019-05-09 | House | Senate amendment amended |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-04-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-02-05 | House | Roll call Yeas-112 Nays-5 |
2019-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-05 | House | Objection by Rep. Weeks |
2019-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Wheeler |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2019-01-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: R.Williams |
2019-01-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 13 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 13 | 72 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 13 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |