SC H3129 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bennett
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bennett
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 7-11-10, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Methods Of Nominating Candidates, So As To Prohibit A Candidate From Filing More Than One Statement Of Intention Of Candidacy For A Single Election, And To Prohibit A Candidate From Being Nominated By More Than One Political Party For A Single Office In An Election, And To Amend Section 7-13-320, Relating To Ballots And Specifications, So As To Prohibit A Candidate's Name From Appearing On The Ballot More Than Once.
Title
Candidate nominations
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Taylor [R] | Rep. Steve Moss [R] | Rep. Randy Ligon [R] | Rep. Bart Blackwell [R] |
Rep. Bruce Bryant [R] | Rep. Linda Bennett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bennett |
2019-02-12 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bryant |
2019-02-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Blackwell |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3129&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3129_20181218.htm |