SC H3200 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Act No. 141
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, To Enact The "south Carolina Lactation Support Act" By Adding Section 41-1-130 So As To Provide Necessary Definitions, To Provide Employers Daily Shall Provide Employees With Reasonable Unpaid Break Time Or Shall Permit Employees To Use Paid Break Time Or Meal Time To Express Breast Milk, To Provide Employers Shall Make Reasonable Efforts To Provide Certain Areas Where Employees May Express Breast Milk, To Provide Employers May Not Discriminate Against Employees For Choosing To Express Breast Milk In The Workplace In Compliance With The Provisions Of This Act, To Allow Noncompliance When An Undue Hardship On The Employer Would Result From Compliance, And To Provide Remedies For Violations; To Provide Related Obligations Of The Human Affairs Commission; To Provide Related Findings And Express The Intention Of The General Assembly; And To Provide A Thirty-day Compliance Period For Employers. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SC Lactation Support

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-24 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 27) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-26 Act No. 141
2020-06-26 Effective date 07/25/20
2020-06-25 Signed By Governor
2020-06-25 Ratified R 146
2020-06-24HouseRoll call Yeas-111 Nays-0
2020-06-24HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2020-05-12SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2020-03-12SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
2020-03-12SenateRead second time
2020-03-12SenateAmended
2020-01-23SenateCommittee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-03-07SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-03-07HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-03-06HouseRoll call Yeas-93 Nays-0
2019-03-06HouseRead second time
2019-03-06HouseAmended
2019-03-05HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey, Norrell, Weeks
2019-02-28HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-02-28HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Cogswell
2019-01-29HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: McDaniel
2019-01-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Brawley
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2018-12-18HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0406 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
411130(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback