SC H3218 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, To Enact The "metal Detectors In Public Schools Act" By Adding Section 59-1-485 So As To Provide That Beginning With The 2020-2021 School Year, Walk-through Metal Detectors Must Be Installed And Operated At All Public Entrances Of Each Public Elementary School, Middle School, High School, And Institution Of Higher Learning In The State; To Define Necessary Terminology; To Provide Related Training In The Use Of These Metal Detectors; To Provide For The Promulgation Of Related Regulations; And To Make These Provisions Contingent Upon Appropriations By The General Assembly.
Title
Metal Detectors in Public Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H4665 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
H5037 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
H5037 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3218&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3218_20181218.htm |