SC H3257 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - Act No. 170
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - Act No. 170
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 59-32-20, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Instruction Required Under The Comprehensive Health Education Act, So As To Require The State Board Of Education To Revise Existing Age-appropriate Standards And Concepts That Address Mental, Emotional, And Social Health During Its Next Cyclical Review. - Ratified Title
Title
Health Education Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-23 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Act No. 170 | |
2020-10-07 | Effective date 09/29/20 | |
2020-09-29 | Signed By Governor | |
2020-09-25 | Ratified R 171 | |
2020-09-23 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Amended |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Education |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-01-22 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2020-01-22 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-01-21 | House | Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-0 |
2020-01-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-21 | House | Amended |
2020-01-16 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-01-15 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2019-05-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Cox |
2019-03-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Elliott |
2019-03-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Wooten, Clary |
2019-01-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hosey, Wheeler |
2019-01-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: King, Ridgeway |
2019-01-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McDaniel, Simmons, Pendarvis, Henderson-Myers, Govan |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |