SC H3278 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 63-17-70, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Court Orders Determining That A Putative Father Is The Legal Father, So As To Require That The Child's Birth Certificate Be Amended; And To Amend Section 44-63-163, Relating To Birth Certificates Prepared After A Paternity Determination, So As To Make Conforming Changes.
Title
Birth certificates prepared after a paternity determination
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0021 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Act No. 42
H4331 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
H4331 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3278&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3278_20181218.htm |