SC H3289 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Article 5 To Chapter 1, Title 1 So As To Enact The "personhood Act Of South Carolina", To Establish That The Right To Life For Each Born And Preborn Human Being Vests At Fertilization And That The Rights Of Due Process And Equal Protection, Guaranteed By Section 3, Article I Of The Constitution Of This State Vest At Fertilization For Each Born And Preborn Human Being.
Title
Personhood
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones |
2019-02-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Young |
2019-02-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon |
2019-01-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gagnon, Yow |
2019-01-24 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Loftis, Stringer, Ligon |
2019-01-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins |
2019-01-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hiott |
2019-01-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Cox, Bryant, McCravy |
2019-01-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: V.S.Moss, Elliott, Trantham, Willis |
2019-01-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0485 (Similar To) 2019-02-06 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3920 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Member
H3920 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Member
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3289&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3289_20181218.htm |