SC H3295 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Sections 63-15-225 And 63-15-235 So As To Create A Rebuttable Presumption That Joint Custody And Equally Shared Parenting Time Are In The Best Interest Of The Child, With Exceptions, At All Stages Of The Custody Determination Process; And To Amend Sections 63-15-220, 63-15-230, And 63-15-240, Relating To Parenting Plans, Final Custody Determinations, And Custody Orders Respectively, So As To Make Conforming Changes.
Title
Child custody
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins |
2020-02-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Stringer |
2020-01-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones, McGinnis |
2019-02-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Morgan |
2019-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Trantham |
2019-01-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Mace |
2019-01-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Loftis, G.R.Smith |
2019-01-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Burns |
2019-01-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Hill |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 15 | 220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 15 | 225 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 15 | 230 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 15 | 235 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 15 | 240 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3295&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3295_20181218.htm |