SC H3301 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Martin
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Martin
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 24-3-530, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Death By Electrocution Or Lethal Injection, So As To Provide That A Person Convicted Of A Capital Crime And Having Imposed Upon Him The Sentence Of Death Shall Suffer The Penalty By Electrocution Or, At The Election Of The Person, Lethal Injection, If It Is Available At The Time Of Election, To Provide That The Penalty Must Be Administered By Electrocution For A Person Who Waives The Right Of Election, And To Provide That If Execution By Lethal Injection Is Unavailable Or Is Held To Be Unconstitutional By An Appellate Court Of Competent Jurisdiction, Then The Manner Of Inflicting A Death Sentence Must Be Electrocution Regardless Of The Method Elected By The Person.
Title
Executions
Sponsors
Rep. Edward Tallon [R] | Rep. Bruce Bryant [R] | Rep. Anne Thayer [R] | Rep. Josiah Magnuson [R] |
Rep. Steve Moss [R] | Rep. Christopher Wooten [R] | Rep. Chip Huggins [R] | Rep. Richard Martin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Martin |
2019-04-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0176 (Similar To) 2020-09-22 - Debate adjourned
H4417 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Atkinson
H4417 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Atkinson
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3301&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3301_20181218.htm |