SC H3305 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 71-3)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 295
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 71-3)
Status: Passed on September 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-09 - Act No. 295
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION TO PROPOSE AN AMENDMENT TO ARTICLE II OF THE CONSTITUTION OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1895, RELATING TO THE RIGHT OF SUFFRAGE, BY ADDING SECTION 12 SO AS TO GUARANTEE THE RIGHT OF AN INDIVIDUAL TO VOTE BY SECRET BALLOT FOR A DESIGNATION, A SELECTION, OR AN AUTHORIZATION FOR EMPLOYEE REPRESENTATION BY A LABOR ORGANIZATION. - ratified title
Title
Guarantee The Right Of An Individual To Vote By Secret Ballot For A Designation, A Selection, Or An Authorization For Employee Representation By A Labor Organization. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-09 | Act No. 295 | |
2010-04-01 | Effective date 03/25/10 | |
2010-03-29 | No signature required | |
2010-03-25 | Ratified R 157 | |
2010-03-10 | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-12 HJ-160 | |
2010-03-10 | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled HJ-158 | |
2010-03-10 | Read third time and returned to House with amendments SJ-39 | |
2010-03-09 | Debate interrupted SJ-41 | |
2010-03-04 | Read second time SJ-42 | |
2010-03-03 | Debate interrupted SJ-28 | |
2010-02-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-02-25 | Debate interrupted SJ-153 | |
2010-02-25 | Amended SJ-153 | |
2010-02-11 | Special order, set for February 11, 2010 SJ-18 | |
2009-05-06 | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary SJ-14 | |
2009-04-16 | Referred to Subcommittee: L.Martin (ch), Rankin, Hutto, Bright, Davis | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-6 | |
2009-03-26 | Introduced and read first time SJ-6 | |
2009-03-26 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-28 | |
2009-03-25 | Roll call Yeas-88 Nays-25 HJ-47 | |
2009-03-25 | Read second time HJ-47 | |
2009-03-24 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: D.C.Moss | |
2009-03-10 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Chalk, Herbkersman, Viers, Spires, Huggins, Limehouse, Stewart, Kelly, Brady | |
2009-03-05 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Barfield | |
2009-03-04 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrester | |
2009-02-26 | Debate adjourned until Tuesday, March 10, 2009 HJ-100 | |
2009-02-26 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Sandifer, Millwood, Haley, Ballentine, M.A.Pitts, Cooper, White, Gambrell, Bowen, Umphlett | |
2009-02-24 | Requests for debate-Rep(s). Bedingfield, Cato, Bannister, JE Smith, Owens, Nanney, GR Smith, King, Skelton, Hiott, Crawford, Lowe, Daning, Sellers, Duncan, Jefferson, and Hart HJ-26 | |
2009-02-24 | Objection by Rep. Cobb-Hunter and RL Brown HJ-26 | |
2009-02-24 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.M.Smith, Battle | |
2009-02-19 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2009-02-19 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Frye, Clemmons | |
2009-02-18 | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary HJ-3 | |
2009-02-11 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Harrell, Delleney, Gullick | |
2009-02-10 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: D.C.Smith, Pinson, J.R.Smith, Simrill, Brantley, Willis, Hamilton, Erickson, Sottile, Scott | |
2009-02-10 | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: McLeod | |
2009-02-10 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rice, Parker, Allison, Littlejohn, Cole, Hiott, Edge, Whitmire, Hearn, Hardwick | |
2009-01-28 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Long | |
2009-01-27 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: T.R.Young | |
2009-01-15 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-440 | |
2009-01-15 | Introduced and read first time HJ-440 |
Same As/Similar To
S0316 (Similar To) 2009-01-27 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-18
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3305&session=118 |