SC H3310 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Act No. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Act No. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 56-19-480, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Transfer And Surrender Of Certificates Of Title, License Plates, Registration Cards, And Manufacturers' Special Plates For Vehicles Sold As Salvage, Abandoned, Scrapped, Or Destroyed, So As To Provide A Procedure For An Insurance Company Or Its Agent To Obtain A Certificate Of Title For A Vehicle From The Department Of Motor Vehicles When A Claimant Fails To Deliver The Title To The Insurance Company Or Its Agent Under Certain Circumstances. - Ratified Title
Title
Transfer and surrender of vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Act No. 17 | |
2019-04-09 | Effective date 04/03/19 | |
2019-04-03 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-04-03 | Ratified R 27 | |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Transportation |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-02-12 | House | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0 |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-12 | House | Amended |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |