SC H3404 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-7)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard, R.Williams, Jefferson, Kimmons, Govan, Kirby, Bales, S.Williams, Mack, Hart, Clyburn
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard, R.Williams, Jefferson, Kimmons, Govan, Kirby, Bales, S.Williams, Mack, Hart, Clyburn
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 59-112-45 So As To Provide People Who Have A Lawful Presence In This State And Are Not Precluded From Establishing Residency Under Federal Immigration Law May Establish Domicile In This State For The Purpose Of Receiving In-state Tuition Rates And Fees At Public Institutions Of Higher Education And For State-supported Scholarships And Grants; And By Adding Section 41-1-35 So As To Provide People Who Have A Lawful Presence In This State And Are Not Precluded From Establishing Residency Under Federal Immigration Law May Establish Residency And Be Eligible For Occupational Or Professional Licensure Under The Provisions Of This Chapter, Provided Other Licensure Requirements Are Met.
Title
Licensure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard, R.Williams, Jefferson, Kimmons, Govan, Kirby, Bales, S.Williams, Mack, Hart, Clyburn |
2019-03-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Atkinson, Alexander, Howard, Parks |
2019-03-27 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Dillard, McKnight, Moore, Ridgeway, Garvin, Stavrinakis, Robinson, Anderson, Hayes, Ott, Simmons, Rivers, Funderburk, Brown, Hosey, Weeks |
2019-03-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Herbkersman, W.Newton |
2019-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers |
2019-01-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Clary |
2019-01-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-01-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bamberg, Forrest |
2019-01-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Rose |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0431 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Referred to Committee on Education