SC H3420 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Act No. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Act No. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 16-17-500, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The "youth Access To Tobacco Prevention Act Of 2006", So As To Strengthen Age Verification Requirements For The Internet Sale Of Tobacco And Alternative Nicotine Products, To Prohibit Minors From Entering Retail Establishments That Primarily Sell Such Products, With Exceptions, And To Create Related Criminal Penalties; To Amend Section 16-17-501, Relating To Terms Defined In The "youth Access To Tobacco Prevention Act Of 2006", So As To Change The Definition For "alternative Nicotine Product" And By Adding A Definition For "electronic Smoking Device", "e-liquid", And "vapor Product"; By Adding Section 59-1-380 So As To Require Local School Districts To Adopt, Implement, And Enforce A Written Policy Prohibiting The Use Of Tobacco And Alternative Nicotine Products On School Campuses And At School Events; To Amend Section 44-95-20, Relating To The Clean Indoor Air Act's Prohibition Of Smoking In Schools, So As To Eliminate The Exclusion For Private Offices And Teachers Lounges; By Adding Section 16-17-506 So As To Establish Limitations On The Sale Of E-liquid Containers And Create Criminal Penalties; And For Other Purposes. - Ratified Title
Title
Youth Access to Tobacco Prevention Act of 2006
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Bernstein [D] | Rep. Kirkman Finlay [R] | Rep. Anne Thayer [R] | Rep. John West [R] |
Rep. Alan Clemmons [R] | Rep. Krystle Matthews [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 1a Amendment Number 1a (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 1a Amendment Number 1a (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Act No. 25 | |
2019-05-03 | Effective date 04/26/19 | |
2019-04-26 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-04-25 | Ratified R 38 | |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-0 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2019-04-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0 |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned to Senate with amendments |
2019-04-09 | House | Senate amendment amended |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2019-03-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Amended |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Amended |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Shealy, Young, McLeod, Senn |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-02-05 | House | Roll call Yeas-117 Nays-0 |
2019-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | House | Amended |
2019-01-31 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Clemmons, Simmons |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2019-01-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: West |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0396 (Similar To) 2019-02-27 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Shealy, Young, McLeod, Senn
H3422 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
H3422 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 17 | 500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 17 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 17 | 506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 95 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 380 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |