SC H3422 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 59-1-380 So As To Prohibit The Use Or Possession Of Any Tobacco Product Or Alternative Nicotine Product In Public Schools; To Amend Section 16-17-501, Relating In Part To The Definition Of "alternative Nicotine Product", So As To Change The Definition; And To Amend Section 44-95-20, Relating In Part To The Prohibition Of Smoking In Public Schools And Preschools, So As To Eliminate The Exclusion For Private Offices And Teachers Lounges.
Title
Tobacco or alternative nicotine products in schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0396 (Similar To) 2019-02-27 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Shealy, Young, McLeod, Senn
H3420 (Similar To) 2019-05-06 - Act No. 25
H3420 (Similar To) 2019-05-06 - Act No. 25
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 17 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 95 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 380 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3422&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3422_20181218.htm |