SC H3595 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Act No. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Act No. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 12-6-3585, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Industry Partnership Fund Tax Credit, So As To Increase The Aggregate Annual Credit Amount, Set Certain Qualifications, And To Require The South Carolina Research Authority To Issue An Annual Report. - Ratified Title
Title
Industry Partnership Fund tax credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Act No. 15 | |
2019-04-02 | Effective date 03/28/19 | |
2019-03-28 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-03-27 | Ratified R 24 | |
2019-03-21 | House | Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-1 |
2019-03-21 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-2 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-02-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-02-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-02-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-6 |
2019-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-06 | House | Amended |
2019-02-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: West, Bannister, Forrest |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2019-01-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson |
2019-01-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Loftis, Clemmons |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0309 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - Conference committee appointed Simrill, Pope, Rutherford