SC H3601 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of Interstate Highway 77 From Its Intersection With Fairfield/richland County Line To Its Intersection With The Fairfield/chester County Line "john M. Spratt, Jr., Freeway" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Portion Of Highway That Contain The Words "john M. Spratt, Jr., Freeway".
Title
John M. Spratt, Jr.
Sponsors
Rep. Boyd Brown [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence | |
2012-05-02 | Recalled from Committee on Transportation | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced | |
2011-02-16 | Adopted, sent to Senate | |
2011-02-16 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2011-02-15 | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions | |
2011-02-08 | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced |