SC H3602 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Act No. 85
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Make Technical Corrections And Conforming Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care decisions for unable to consent persons

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Free Conference Report (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate: To Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House: Adopt Free Conference Report (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House: Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Act No. 85
2019-06-10 Effective date 05/24/19
2019-05-24 Signed By Governor
2019-05-22 Ratified R 106
2019-05-21SenateOrdered enrolled for ratification
2019-05-21SenateRoll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
2019-05-21SenateFree conference report adopted
2019-05-21SenateFree conference committee appointed Davis, Gambrell, Johnson
2019-05-21SenateRoll call Ayes-46 Nays-0
2019-05-21SenateFree conference powers granted
2019-05-20HouseRoll call Yeas-98 Nays-0
2019-05-20HouseFree conference report adopted
2019-05-20HouseFree conference committee appointed Rose, G.M. Smith, Johnson
2019-05-20HouseRoll call Yeas-108 Nays-0
2019-05-20HouseFree conference powers granted
2019-05-09SenateConference committee appointed Davis, Gambrell, Johnson
2019-05-09HouseHouse insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. Rose, G.M. Smith, Johnson
2019-05-09SenateNon-concurrence in House amendment
2019-05-09HouseReturned to Senate with amendments
2019-05-09HouseSenate amendment amended
2019-05-08SenateRoll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
2019-05-08SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2019-05-08SenateAmended
2019-05-08 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-05-07SenateRead second time
2019-05-07SenateAmended
2019-04-25SenateCommittee report: Favorable Medical Affairs
2019-04-02SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2019-04-02SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-03-28HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-03-27HouseRoll call Yeas-104 Nays-4
2019-03-27HouseRead second time
2019-03-27HouseAmended
2019-03-27HouseRequests for debate removed-Rep
2019-03-27HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Weeks
2019-03-26HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2019-03-20HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2019-01-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey
2019-01-15HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
442640(n/a)See Bill Text
442650(n/a)See Bill Text
442660(n/a)See Bill Text
446630(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3602&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3602_20190115.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3602_20190320.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3602_20190327.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3602_20190425.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3602_20190507.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3602_20190508.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3602_20190508A.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3602_20190509.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3602_20190521.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16203
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16723
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16870
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16871
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16876
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16877

Bill Comments

feedback