SC H3630 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Act No. 96
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Act No. 96
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Delay The Property Tax Penalty Schedule By Three Months On Real Property Owned By Certain Individuals Affected By The Shutdown Of The Federal Government. - Ratified Title
Title
Property tax penalty schedule
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | Act No. 96 | |
2019-02-28 | Effective date 02/21/19 | |
2019-02-21 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-02-20 | Ratified R 5 | |
2019-02-14 | House | Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0 |
2019-02-14 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Amended |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Finance |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-01-18 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-01-17 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2019-01-17 | House | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0 |
2019-01-17 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Clary, Brown, Gilliard, King, Mack, Erickson, Bradley, McDaniel, Moore, Simmons, Funderburk, Norrell |
2019-01-16 | House | Recalled from Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced and read first time |