SC H3697 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Act No. 102
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Act No. 102
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That Notwithstanding The Provisions Of Regulation 62-6-(d), South Carolina Code Of Regulations, Relating To The Requirement That At Least Twenty-five Percent Of Curriculum Requirements For Certain Academic Programs Must Be Earned Through Instruction By The Institution Awarding The Degree, The Commission On Higher Education May Grant Alternate Program Completion Options To Students Impacted By The Closure Of Six Education Corporation Of America, Inc., Higher Education Providers In South Carolina In 2018. - Ratified Title
Title
Degree curriculum requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Taylor [R] | Rep. Merita Allison [R] | Rep. Wendell Gilliard [D] | Rep. Krystle Matthews [D] |
Rep. Jimmy Bales [D] | Rep. JA Moore [D] | Rep. Jerry Govan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | Act No. 102 | |
2019-03-27 | Effective date See Act for Effective Date | |
2019-03-20 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-03-19 | Ratified R 18 | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Education |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-01-23 | House | Roll call Yeas-113 Nays-0 |
2019-01-23 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bales, Moore, Govan |
2019-01-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |