SC H3729 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 63-7-310, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Mandated Reporting Of Suspected Child Abuse Or Neglect, So As To Require Reporting When An Infant Or Fetus Is Exposed To Alcohol Or Controlled Substances.
Title
Abuse or neglect, mandated reporting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow |
2019-04-09 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2019-04-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Crawford |
2019-03-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Felder |
2019-01-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.R.Smith, Johnson, Hardee, Dillard, Robinson, Garvin, S.Williams, Sandifer |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced and read first time |