SC H3730 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Goldfinch, McLeod, Senn, Rice
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Goldfinch, McLeod, Senn, Rice
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 44-53-370, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating In Part To The Trafficking Offenses For Certain Controlled Substances, So As To Add An Offense For "trafficking In Fentanyl".
Title
Controlled substances, trafficking offenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Waive Rule 5.15 Printing (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Waive Rule 5.15 Printing (Y: 48 N: 53 NV: 4 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Waive Rule 5.15 Printing (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Waive Rule 5.15 Printing (Y: 48 N: 53 NV: 4 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Goldfinch, McLeod, Senn, Rice |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Shealy, Young, McLeod, Senn |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-10 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0 |
2019-04-09 | House | Read second time |
2019-04-09 | House | Amended |
2019-04-09 | House | Reconsidered |
2019-04-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 |
2019-04-09 | House | Read second time |
2019-04-09 | House | Amended |
2019-04-09 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton, B.Newton |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2019-04-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Martin |
2019-01-30 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.R.Smith, Johnson, Hardee, Dillard, Robinson, Garvin, S.Williams, Sandifer |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced and read first time |